GOVERNORS
List of Governors
Governor | Role |
Sub-committee membership |
Date appointed | End of term |
Anand Pajpani |
Chair of Governors & Parent Governor |
Finance & personnel, Website and Social Media, Pay Panel Acting Safeguarding Governor |
10th Sept 2021 |
Sept 2025 |
Tony Murphy | Vice - Chair of Governors & Community Governor | Chair of Finance & Pay Panel |
1st Sept 2012 |
August 2024 |
Jean Lammiman | LA Governor | Leadership & management, Finance & personnel, Pay panel |
1st Sept. 2012 |
August 2024 |
Sage Ball | Headteacher | Leaderhip & management, Finance & personnel, Pay panel |
10th January 2022 |
|
Simon Sackwild | Co-opted Governor | Safeguarding |
10th February 2009 |
August 2023 |
Jackie O Hanlon | Staff Governor |
4th October 2023 |
October 2027 | |
Tim Nguessan | Co-opted Governor | Finance |
2nd Sept. 2012 |
August 2024 |
Seth Garr | Co-opted Governor |
19th October 2019 |
October 2023 | |
Jackie Jessamy-Fuller | Co-opted Governor |
10th May 2022 |
May 2026 | |
Stephen Spiro | GB member for Governor Induction | Finance |
4th October 2022 |
October 2026 |
Hema Aran |
Parent Governor |
15th November 2023 |
November 2027 |
|
Rosemary Nkansh |
Parent Governor |
17th November 2024 |
November 2028 |
|
Harriet D'Cruz |
Co-opted Governor |
8th May 2024 |
May 2028 |
Governors' attendance record
Attendance record | 8/05/24 | 17/1/24 | 15/11/23 | 4/10/23 | 28/6/23 | 10/5/23 | 8/3/23 | 17/1/23 |
Anand Pajpani | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y |
Jean Lammiman | N | Y | N | N | Y | N | N | N |
Tony Murphy | Y | N | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y |
Tim Nguessan | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y |
Simon Sackwild | Y | Y | N | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y |
Cathy George | End of term | N | Y | Y | Y | Y | ||
Seth Garr | N | N | N | N | N | N | N | N |
Bob Pattni | Resigned | N | Y | N | Y | Y | ||
Jackie Jessamy-Fuller | N | Y | Y | Y | Y | N | Y | Y |
Stephen Spiro | N | Y | N | N | Y | N | Y | Y |
Julia Kearons |
Resigned |
N |
N
|
N | Y | N |
New Governor |
|
Jackie O Hanlon |
Y |
Y |
Y |
New Governor |
|
|||
Hema Aran |
Y |
Y |
New Governor |
|
||||
Rosemary Nkansh |
N |
New Governor |
|
|
||||
Harriet D'Cruz |
Y |
New Governor |
|
|
Governors' business interests and declarations
Governor | Business and other interests |
Anand Pajpani |
Local Advisory Board Member of Alexandra School |
Jean Lammiman |
Governor of Stanmore College, Advisory Board member of Regent College Group, Freeman of the City of London, Member of Pinner Association |
Tim Nguessan | NEU, ATM |
Simon Sackwild |
NEU Rep for SEND in Harrow Spouse works for CAAS Harrow |
Jackie O Hanlon | None |
Tony Murphy |
Director of TME 37 Ltd, Member of St Teresa's School Governing Body |
Seth Garr |
None |
Jackie Jessamy-Fuller |
Employee of Vodafone Group |
Stephen Spiro |
Trustee Rennie Grove Hospice Care Royal College of Physicians British Thoracic Society Teacher UCL |
Hema Aran |
None |
Rosemary Nkansh |
None |
Harriet D'Cruz |
Director Bright Start Day Care LTD |
Governors' areas of responsibilities
Area | Governor | Teacher with Lead Responsibility | Visits Made |
Personal Development | Sage Ball | 5/5/2022 | |
Leadership and Management | Anand Pajpani | Sage Ball | |
Finance | Tony Murphy | Sage Ball, Maria Kelly | |
Safeguarding & Children Looked After | Acting Anand Pajpani | Simon Sackwild | |
Health & Safety |
Seth Garr Tony Murphy |
Dean West Varsha Mistry |
11/01/2024 30/3/2023 |
Parent Engagement | Jackie Jessamy-Fuller | Simon Sackwild | |
Sixth Form | Seth Garr | Emma Coulson | |
SEND-Statutory duty | Jean Lammiman | Sage Ball | |
Website and Social Media | Anand Pajpani | Matt Evans | 01/2/2022 |
Literacy | Mark Kearney | ||
Numeracy | Gerson Sanchez | ||
Recruitment/Agency Staff | Maria Kelly, Sage Ball | ||
Governor Skills Analysis/Training and Records | Jean Lammiman | Maria Kelly, Sage Ball | |
Pupil Premium Spending | Tony Murphy | Sage Ball | |
Behaviour and Attendance |
Tim Nguessan Harriet D'Cruz |
Ben Murray, Maria Mather | 5/5/2023 |
Income Generation/Fundraising | Stephen Spiro | Debbie Stone | |
Induction Process for Staff, Parents, Governors | Stephen Spiro | Sage Ball | |
Careers | Seth Garr | Debbie Stone |
Governors Instrument of Governance
Governors Instrument of Governance - Click here to view the document
Governors Allowances Statement
Governors Allowances Statement - Click here to view the document